|
08/12/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 188, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2356.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1565.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. (action corrected May 4, 2015)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|