California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1403 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 15, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015