Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1203.) From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|