California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1405 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill June 17, 2015
Bill June 3, 2015
Bill May 11, 2015
Bill May 4, 2015