California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 14, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill July 9, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015