LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB141
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB141
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB141
Compare Versions
AB141 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB141 Amended September 4, 2015
AB141 Amended July 9, 2015
AB141 Amended June 1, 2015
AB141 Amended April 7, 2015
AB141 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB141 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB141 Amended September 4, 2015
AB141 Amended July 9, 2015
AB141 Amended June 1, 2015
AB141 Amended April 7, 2015
AB141 Introduced January 9, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare