|
07/16/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1662.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1452.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|