California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill May 7, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015