Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1559.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|