LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1431
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1431
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1431
Compare Versions
AB1431 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1431 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB1431 Amended August 27, 2015
AB1431 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1431 Amended June 25, 2015
AB1431 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1431 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1431 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1431 Chaptered October 10, 2015
AB1431 Enrolled September 9, 2015
AB1431 Amended August 27, 2015
AB1431 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1431 Amended June 25, 2015
AB1431 Amended April 30, 2015
AB1431 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1431 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare