|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 119, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 5635.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after May 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3963.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wieckowski.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 14). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1110.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|