LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1432
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1432
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1432
Compare Versions
AB1432 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1432 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB1432 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1432 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1432 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1432 Amended June 29, 2015
AB1432 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1432 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1432 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1432 Enrolled August 2, 2016
AB1432 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1432 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1432 Amended July 16, 2015
AB1432 Amended June 29, 2015
AB1432 Amended March 26, 2015
AB1432 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare