|
10/08/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 602, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 3083.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2621.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/15/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 1551.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|