LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1448
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1448
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1448
Compare Versions
AB1448 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB1448 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1448 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1448 Amended July 15, 2015
AB1448 Amended June 16, 2015
AB1448 Amended May 14, 2015
AB1448 Amended May 6, 2015
AB1448 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1448 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1448 Chaptered October 8, 2015
AB1448 Enrolled September 14, 2015
AB1448 Amended September 4, 2015
AB1448 Amended July 15, 2015
AB1448 Amended June 16, 2015
AB1448 Amended May 14, 2015
AB1448 Amended May 6, 2015
AB1448 Amended April 23, 2015
AB1448 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare