|
10/01/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 392, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 2907.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2406.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 9. Page 1778.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/26/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 13.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|