California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 1, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill February 25, 2015