|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 6026.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4975.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4724.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 3503.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2015
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|