California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill May 26, 2016
Bill January 14, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 22, 2015
Bill April 7, 2015