LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB15
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB15
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2014
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 11, 2015
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 4, 2015
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 1, 2015
Compare
Bill
July 15, 2015
Compare
Bill
May 6, 2015
Compare
Bill
March 26, 2015
Compare