LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB15
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB15
Compare Versions
AB15 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB15 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB15 Amended September 1, 2015
AB15 Amended July 15, 2015
AB15 Amended May 6, 2015
AB15 Amended March 26, 2015
AB15 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
AB15 Chaptered October 4, 2015
AB15 Enrolled September 11, 2015
AB15 Amended September 1, 2015
AB15 Amended July 15, 2015
AB15 Amended May 6, 2015
AB15 Amended March 26, 2015
AB15 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare