|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 730, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2015
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 3024.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 2589.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 27. Page 1840.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (May 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|