California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 2, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill May 14, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015