|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 792, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2906.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2411.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 26. Page 1440.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|