California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1509 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill August 31, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015