California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1517 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 12, 2015

Amended

Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015