LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1517
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1517
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1517
Compare Versions
AB1517 Chaptered August 12, 2015
AB1517 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB1517 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1517 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1517 Amended April 8, 2015
AB1517 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB1517 Chaptered August 12, 2015
AB1517 Enrolled July 21, 2015
AB1517 Amended June 1, 2015
AB1517 Amended April 16, 2015
AB1517 Amended April 8, 2015
AB1517 Introduced March 10, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare