|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 755, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3155.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2692.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Referred to suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2015
|
Measure version as amended on August 17 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1637.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|