California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 10, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 3, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill July 2, 2015
Bill May 21, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015