California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB154 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2015

Amended

Bill August 26, 2015
Bill June 30, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015