LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB154
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB154
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB154
Compare Versions
AB154 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB154 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB154 Amended August 26, 2015
AB154 Amended June 30, 2015
AB154 Amended May 28, 2015
AB154 Amended May 20, 2015
AB154 Amended March 26, 2015
AB154 Introduced January 16, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB154 Chaptered September 30, 2015
AB154 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB154 Amended August 26, 2015
AB154 Amended June 30, 2015
AB154 Amended May 28, 2015
AB154 Amended May 20, 2015
AB154 Amended March 26, 2015
AB154 Introduced January 16, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare