California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1557 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 3, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill May 11, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 15, 2016
Bill March 8, 2016
Bill February 25, 2016