LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1557
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1557
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1557
Compare Versions
AB1557 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1557 Enrolled August 3, 2016
AB1557 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1557 Amended April 26, 2016
AB1557 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1557 Amended March 8, 2016
AB1557 Amended February 25, 2016
AB1557 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1557 Chaptered August 17, 2016
AB1557 Enrolled August 3, 2016
AB1557 Amended May 11, 2016
AB1557 Amended April 26, 2016
AB1557 Amended March 15, 2016
AB1557 Amended March 8, 2016
AB1557 Amended February 25, 2016
AB1557 Introduced January 4, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare