|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 257, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6220.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4979.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4684.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|