California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill August 8, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016