California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB156 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2015

Amended

Bill May 17, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill March 26, 2015