LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB156
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB156
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB156
Compare Versions
AB156 Amended May 17, 2016
AB156 Amended May 4, 2016
AB156 Amended August 18, 2015
AB156 Amended July 1, 2015
AB156 Amended June 23, 2015
AB156 Amended June 1, 2015
AB156 Amended April 27, 2015
AB156 Amended April 16, 2015
AB156 Amended March 26, 2015
AB156 Introduced January 20, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB156 Amended May 17, 2016
AB156 Amended May 4, 2016
AB156 Amended August 18, 2015
AB156 Amended July 1, 2015
AB156 Amended June 23, 2015
AB156 Amended June 1, 2015
AB156 Amended April 27, 2015
AB156 Amended April 16, 2015
AB156 Amended March 26, 2015
AB156 Introduced January 20, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare