|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 258, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6103.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4869.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4784.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|