California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1570 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2016

Amended

Bill June 8, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016