California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB159 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 19, 2015
Bill June 16, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 28, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015