LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB159
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB159
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB159
Compare Versions
AB159 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB159 Amended July 6, 2015
AB159 Amended June 19, 2015
AB159 Amended June 16, 2015
AB159 Amended June 1, 2015
AB159 Amended April 28, 2015
AB159 Amended April 13, 2015
AB159 Introduced January 21, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
AB159 Enrolled September 4, 2015
AB159 Amended July 6, 2015
AB159 Amended June 19, 2015
AB159 Amended June 16, 2015
AB159 Amended June 1, 2015
AB159 Amended April 28, 2015
AB159 Amended April 13, 2015
AB159 Introduced January 21, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare