|
09/26/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6435.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5307.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 24. Page 4497.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (April 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|