California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 3, 2016