California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill July 1, 2016

Chaptered

Bill July 1, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016