LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1618
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1618
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1618
Compare Versions
AB1618 Enrolled July 1, 2016
AB1618 Chaptered July 1, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 23, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1618 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1618 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1618 Enrolled July 1, 2016
AB1618 Chaptered July 1, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 23, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 15, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1618 Amended June 13, 2016
AB1618 Amended April 14, 2016
AB1618 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare