|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6544.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6552.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (August 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6514.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6401.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Measure version as amended on August 18 corrected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 5238.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5167.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2016
|
Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/14/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|