California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1637 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 18, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016