California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1639 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016
Bill March 9, 2016