LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1639
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1639
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1639
Compare Versions
AB1639 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB1639 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1639 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1639 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1639 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1639 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1639 Amended March 9, 2016
AB1639 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB1639 Chaptered September 29, 2016
AB1639 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB1639 Amended August 15, 2016
AB1639 Amended June 14, 2016
AB1639 Amended April 7, 2016
AB1639 Amended March 29, 2016
AB1639 Amended March 9, 2016
AB1639 Introduced January 7, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare