California 2015 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1651 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 08/30/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1651ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 29, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 19, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 15, 2016 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 20, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 17, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Obernolte JANUARY 12, 2016 An act to add Sections 324.7 and 324.8 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1651, Obernolte. Public Utilities Commission: contracts. Existing law generally authorizes state agencies, including the Public Utilities Commission, to enter into contracts, and requires those contracts to be awarded by competitive bidding pursuant to procedures set forth in the Public Contract Code, subject to certain exceptions. This bill would require the commission to make available on its Internet Web site free of charge information about each contract that it enters into, including specified information about the contract and contracting parties. The bill would require this information to be published no less frequently than once a year. The bill would also require the commission to make available on its Internet Web site audits conducted by the Department of General Services of the commission's contracting practices. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. This act shall be known, and may be cited, as the Public Utilities Commission Contracting Transparency Act of 2016. SEC. 2. Section 324.7 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 324.7. No less frequently than once a year, the commission shall make the following information about each contract that the commission enters into available free of charge on its Internet Web site: (a) The names, addresses, and points of contact of the parties to the contract. (b) The goods and services requested, as applicable. (c) The contract value. SEC. 3. Section 324.8 is added to the Public Utilities Code, to read: 324.8. The commission shall make available on its Internet Web site audits conducted by the Department of General Services of the commission's contracting practices.