California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1651 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 20, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016